Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Andrea Gelsomini, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
1579¹16.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
9 Jun 162562.4AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
8 Dec 162966.9DiedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Andrea Gelsomini
Bishop Francesco Andrea Gelsomini O.E.S.A. (born 1563, died ) Bishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 96
  • bp/b/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • bp/b/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1625, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast