Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Deacon Johann Philipp von Gebsattel

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1555Born
4 Feb 159943.7SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
19 Jul 159944.1ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 Jun 160954.1DiedBishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Philipp von Gebsattel (VIAF: 15568532)
Deacon Johann Philipp von Gebsattel (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Bamberg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 109
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1599

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast