Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Egidio Gavazzi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Subiaco, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1905Born
13 Nov 193227.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Nov 193530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
20 Oct 195146.1AppointedCoadjutor Abbot of Subiaco, Italy
26 May 196458.7SucceededAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
3 Jul 197468.8ResignedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
1 Jun 199084.7DiedAbbot Emeritus of Subiaco, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Gavazzi
Abbot Egidio Gavazzi O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Subiaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano

  • a priest for 54.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 3 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jul 2017