Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Gallart Traginer

Deceased

Bishop of Vic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1558¹BornValencia
11 Mar 160951.1AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
9 Aug 160951.6Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
19 Mar 161254.2AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
16 Dec 161355.9DiedBishop of Vic, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio Gallart Traginer:
Bishop Antonio Gallart Traginer (died ) Bishop of Vic

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 181, and Page 367
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,025
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 125, Number 797

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015