Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Arévalo de Zuaco

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Apr 1598AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
26 Jul 1598Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
10 Jan 1611DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Arévalo de Zuaco
Bishop Francisco Arévalo de Zuaco (died ) Bishop of Gerona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSegovia, Diocese of Segovia
Death PlacePerpignan, Diocese of Perpignan-Elne, France

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,024
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 194
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 110, Number 702
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast