Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de Paula Garcés Marcilla, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Huesca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1656BornFormiche el Bajo
10 May 170044.2AppointedBishop of Barbastro, Spain
29 Jun 170044.3Ordained BishopBishop of Barbastro, Spain
24 Sep 170852.5AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
14 Jul 171458.3DiedBishop of Huesca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Paula Garcés Marcilla:
Bishop Francisco de Paula Garcés Marcilla O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Huesca

  • a bishop for 14.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,629
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 20, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013