Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Palmerio Garau Onida

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1825Born
2 Jun 184923.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 189367.9AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
24 Mar 189569.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
27 Mar 190680.7DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Palmerio Garau Onida
Bishop Palmerio Garau Onida (born , died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSamassi, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 578
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1895, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017