Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François de Gain de Montaignac

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1744Born
11 Aug 178238.5SelectedBishop of Tarbes, France
23 Sep 178238.7ConfirmedBishop of Tarbes, France
20 Oct 178238.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tarbes, France
6 Oct 180157.7ResignedBishop of Tarbes, France
1806¹61.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarbes, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François de Gain de Montaignac (VIAF: 62662684)
Bishop François de Gain de Montaignac (born , died 1806) Bishop Emeritus of Tarbes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontaignac

  • a bishop for 23.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1782, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 392

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast