Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giosuč de Gaeta

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Dec 1480AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
23 Jun 1509ResignedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
18 May 1513AppointedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy
1517¹ResignedBishop of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giosuč de Gaeta
Bishop Giosuč de Gaeta , Bishop Emeritus of Ascoli Satriano (Puglia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 120
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,480, Number 35*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast