Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sigmund Friedrich Fugger von Kirchberg

Deceased

Bishop of Regensburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1542Born
2 Jul 159855.7SelectedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
26 Oct 159856.0ConfirmedBishop of Regensburg, Germany
5 Nov 160058.1DiedBishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Sigmund Friedrich Fugger von Kirchberg (VIAF: 6007950)
Bishop Sigmund Friedrich Fugger von Kirchberg (born , died ) Bishop of Regensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAugsburg, Diocese of Augsburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 22*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 291

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast