Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Wenzel Xaver Frey von Freyenfels

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

Titular See: Macropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1705BornBrno
16 Apr 172923.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
16 Dec 177166.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
2 Feb 177266.3Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic
17 Oct 177671.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz), Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Johann Wenzel Xaver Frey von Freyenfels:
Bishop Johann Wenzel Xaver Frey von Freyenfels (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Olmütz)

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013