Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henri Fuchs

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lausanne, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
May 1624Born
164520.6Ordained PriestPriest of Lausanne, Switzerland
4 Oct 165834.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lausanne, Switzerland
26 Jun 166238.1ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lausanne, Switzerland
24 Jan 168964.7DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lausanne, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Henri Fuchs
Father Henri Fuchs (born May 1624, died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lausanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFribourg

  • a priest for 44.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018