Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Fregoso (Campofregoso)

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

Bishop of Ajaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1428¹BornGenoa
7 Feb 145325.1AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
12 Apr 145628.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
15 May 148052.4Elevated to Cardinal
20 May 1480³52.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
1483¹55.0AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
1489¹61.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
26 Mar 149365.2AppointedAdministrator of Acci (Accia), France
21 Feb 149466.1ResignedAdministrator of Acci (Accia), France
13 Feb 149567.1ResignedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
29 Jul 149668.6AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
22 Mar 149870.2DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Fregoso (Campofregoso):
Cardinal Paolo Fregoso (Campofregoso) (died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a bishop for 41.9 years
  • a cardinal for 17.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 May 1480
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 167
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,668

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013