Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Maria Francia, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1653BornCivitatis Paulae
9 Aug 167622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Jun 169743.6AppointedBishop of Oria, Italy
9 Jun 169743.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oria, Italy
28 Jan 171965.3DiedBishop of Oria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Francia:
Bishop Tommaso Maria Francia O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Oria

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015