Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Fabiani

Deceased

Bishop of Belcastro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1688Born
26 Mar 171224.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 175567.0AppointedBishop of Belcastro, Italy
19 Mar 175567.1Ordained BishopBishop of Belcastro, Italy
3 Dec 177890.8DiedBishop of Belcastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Thomas Fabiani
Bishop Thomas Fabiani (born , died ) Bishop of Belcastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMaida

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast