Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father António de Santo Ilídio da Fonseca e Silva, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Priest of Order of Saint Benedict


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1784BornPorto
26 Feb 184055.7SelectedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
1844¹59.5ResignedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
28 Jan 184964.6DiedPriest of Order of Saint Benedict

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António de Santo Ilídio da Fonseca e Silva
Father António de Santo Ilídio da Fonseca e Silva O.S.B. (born , died ) Priest of Order of Saint Benedict

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016