Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Fonseca

Deceased

Bishop of Guadix, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Nov 1593AppointedBishop of Guadix, Spain
27 Nov 1594³Ordained BishopBishop of Guadix, Spain
16 Nov 1604DiedBishop of Guadix, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Fonseca
Bishop Juan Fonseca (died ) Bishop of Guadix

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUbeda, Diocese of Jaén

  • a bishop for 9.9 years

Source(s):
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 206
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 107, Number 680
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,594, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast