Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Fonseca, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1503¹Born
9 Jan 154542.0AppointedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
27 Jun 155047.4ResignedBishop of Pamplona, Spain
19 Jan 155754.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Pamplona, Spain
155855.0AppointedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Fonseca
Bishop Antonio de Fonseca O.S.A. (born 1503, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToro, Diocese of Zamora
Death PlaceValladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 57, Number 315
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 268, and Page 213
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,545, Number 1*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast