Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Folch y Cardona

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1445¹Born
11 Dec 147227.9AppointedBishop of Urgell, Spain
8 Jan 151570.0AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
11 Apr 153085.2DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Folch y Cardona
Archbishop Pedro Folch y Cardona (born 1445, died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 260
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1472, Number 52*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast