Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro da Firenze, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun), China

Note/Previous Titular See: in partibus Tartarorum


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1310AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cambaluc (Peking, Khanbaliq), China
19 Feb 1311Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Cambaluc (Peking, Khanbaliq), China
1332²AppointedBishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun), China
1362²DiedBishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun), China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro da Firenze
Bishop Pietro da Firenze O.F.M. (died 1362) Bishop of Zaitun (Zeiton; Zaitoun)

  • a bishop for 50.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,377
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast