Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal Fillastre

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

Administrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1348²Born
6 Jun 141163.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
6 Jun 141163.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jul 141466.5AppointedAdministrator of Aix, France
13 Nov 142072.8AppointedAdministrator of Aix, France
3 Jul 142274.5AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
6 Nov 142880.8DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Fillastre
Guillaume Cardinal Fillastre (born 1348, died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Suze

  • a cardinal for 17.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Jun 1411

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018