Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Enrico Filangeri, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Administrator of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1215¹Born
1231²16.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
27 Apr 125237.3AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
30 Oct 125338.8AppointedAdministrator of Albano, Italy
1255²40.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
11 Oct 125843.7DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico Filangeri
Archbishop Enrico Filangeri O.P. (born 1215, died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNocera, Diocese of Nocera de’ Pagani
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 3.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128
  • b: CB, 21 Aug 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 241, Number 20,180

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast