Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaspar Juan de la Figuera, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lérida


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jun 1578AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
21 Sep 1578Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
28 Mar 1583AppointedBishop of Albarracin, Spain
12 Aug 1585AppointedBishop of Lérida, Spain
13 Feb 1586DiedBishop of Lérida, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Juan de la Figuera:
Bishop Gaspar Juan de la Figuera C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Lérida

  • a bishop for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128, Number 11,489
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 89, Number 545
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 214, and Page 100
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 2 Dec 2013