Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Enrique Figaredo Alvargonzález, S.J.

Prefect of Battambang, Cambodia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1959 Born
15 Oct 197920.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
4 Jul 199232.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1 Apr 200040.5AppointedPrefect of Battambang, Cambodia
2 Jul 200040.7InstalledPrefect of Battambang, Cambodia

MicroData Summary for Enrique Figaredo Alvargonzález
Father Enrique Figaredo Alvargonzález S.J. (born ) Prefect of Battambang

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGijón, Spain

Please contact the Father through the Prefecture Apostolic of Battambang.

  • a priest for years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast