Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adriano Cardinal Fieschi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1788Born
23 Jun 183446.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Sep 183850.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
13 Sep 183850.5Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 184354.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
19 Dec 185365.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
6 Feb 185869.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria

MicroData Summary for Adriano Fieschi
Adriano Cardinal Fieschi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGenoa, Italy

  • a cardinal for 23.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018