Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís de Figueiredo e Lemos

Deceased

Bishop of Funchal, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1544Born
11 Dec 158541.3AppointedBishop of Funchal, Portugal
30 Mar 158641.6Ordained BishopBishop of Funchal, Portugal
26 Nov 160864.2DiedBishop of Funchal, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Luís de Figueiredo e Lemos (VIAF: 25034033)
Bishop Luís de Figueiredo e Lemos (born , died ) Bishop of Funchal

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto, Diocese of Porto
Ordained BishopTrinité, Convent, Lisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}
Death PlaceFunchal, Diocese of Funchal

  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,724
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 199
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1586, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast