Catholic-Hierarchy DC

[Royal Bishop JŠnos Feja] †

Hungarian Royal

Not in Union with the Holy See

Deceased

Bishop of [Scutari (Royal), Albania]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1707Born
1735²27.0Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 177769.4AppointedBishop of [Scutari (Royal), Albania]
12 Nov 178476.8DiedBishop of [Scutari (Royal), Albania]

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for JŠnos Feja
Bishop JŠnos Feja (born , died ) Bishop of Scutari

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBodafalva
Death PlaceSpiš

  • a priest for 49.8 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 14 Sep 2020

Quantcast