Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Lipót Fehér, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1842Born
11 Jul 189250.2AppointedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary
27 Oct 190967.5DiedAbbot of Pannonhalma, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Lipót Fehér
Abbot Lipót Fehér O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot of Pannonhalma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIpolyvisk

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast