Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Fernández de Frías

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Mar 1379AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
23 Jan 1394Elevated to Cardinal
1396¹AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
1404²ResignedBishop of Osma, Spain
23 Sep 1412AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
26 Jun 1419AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
19 Sep 1420DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fernández de Frías:
Cardinal Pedro Fernández de Frías (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

  • a cardinal for 26.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jan 1394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013