Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Urban Federer, O.S.B.

Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1968 Born
1 Nov 199224.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Jun 199425.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
10 Dec 201345.3AppointedAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland
22 Dec 201345.3InstalledAbbot of Maria Einsiedeln, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Urban Federer
Abbot Urban Federer O.S.B. (born ) Abbot of Maria Einsiedeln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZurigo-Fluntern

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Maria Einsiedeln.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2013
  • i: CB, 10 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018