Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Angelus Farfulfi, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1648Born
24 Feb 166517.1ProfessedMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
25 Jul 167123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Observant Friars Minor
28 Apr 171365.2AppointedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia
17 Mar 171567.1DiedBishop of Trogir (Tra¨), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Michael Angelus Farfulfi
Bishop Michael Angelus Farfulfi O.F.M. Obs. (born , died ) Bishop of Trogir (Tra¨)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCreten

  • a priest for 43.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 384
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1713, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast