Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Farnham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Durham, England


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Jan 1241AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
9 Jun 1241Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
2 Feb 1249ResignedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
1258²DiedBishop Emeritus of Durham, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Farnham:
Bishop Nicolas Farnham , Bishop Emeritus of Durham

  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 59
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 286

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015