Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ranuccio Cardinal Farnese, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Administrator of Bologna

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1530Born
13 Aug 154414.0AppointedAdministrator of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 154515.3Elevated to Cardinal
5 May 154615.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Lucia in Orphea
8 Oct 154616.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
8 Oct 154616.1AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
12 Feb 154716.5AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Mar 154716.6AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
22 Feb 154918.5ResignedAdministrator of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 Oct 154919.1AppointedAdministrator of Ravenna, Italy
19 Mar 155019.6ResignedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1554¹23.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
28 Apr 156433.7AppointedAdministrator of Bologna, Italy
7 Feb 156534.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
29 Oct 156535.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ranuccio Farnese (VIAF: 67290890)
Ranuccio Cardinal Farnese O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastello Valentano, Viterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
Death PlaceParma, Diocese of Parma, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Parma, Diocese of Parma, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Family Tomb, Oratory of St. Maria, Lake Bolsena

  • a cardinal for 19.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1545
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 177, and Page 255
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 283
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Oct 2017