Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Farnese

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1619Born
14 Nov 164425.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
4 Dec 164526.3Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jul 164727.9DiedCardinal-Deacon

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Farnese (VIAF: 69778324)
Francesco Maria Cardinal Farnese (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Nov 1644

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast