Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Maria Farina, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Termoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1659Born
29 Sep 168324.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Mar 171858.4AppointedBishop of Termoli, Italy
19 Mar 171858.4Ordained BishopBishop of Termoli, Italy
Dec 1718³59.1DiedBishop of Termoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Maria Farina
Bishop Tommaso Maria Farina O.P. (born , died Dec 1718) Bishop of Termoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 376
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast