Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Falconi

Deceased

Bishop of Castellaneta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1622BornCivitate Ducali
11 Mar 167351.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 167351.2AppointedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy
Jan 167755.0DiedBishop of Castellaneta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Falconi:
Bishop Carlo Falconi Bishop of Castellaneta

  • a priest for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013