Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Antonio Cardinal Facchinetti (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Mar 1575BornBologna, Italy
18 Dec 159116.7Elevated to Cardinal
4 Mar 159216.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
18 May 160631.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Facchinetti (Jr.):
Giovanni Antonio Cardinal Facchinetti (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

  • a cardinal for 14.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1591

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015