Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Fabriano, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Caorle, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1446AppointedBishop of Svač, Serbia
30 Nov 1446Ordained BishopBishop of Svač, Serbia
20 Apr 1465AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
1469¹DiedBishop of Caorle, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Fabriano
Bishop Antonio de Fabriano O.F.M. (died 1469) Bishop of Caorle

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Posterula, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 243, and Page 117
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,761

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 11 Aug 2018

Quantcast