Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ippolito Fabiani, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537²Born
17 Dec 160770.9AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
24 Aug 162184.6DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ippolito Fabiani
Bishop Ippolito Fabiani O.S.A. (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMercato Saraceno

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 151
  • bp/d: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Number 18,211
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast