Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Emiliano Fabbricatore, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1938Born
10 Nov 195820.2EnteredMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
11 Nov 196123.2Solemn VowsMember of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
20 Nov 196426.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
13 Aug 196527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
31 Jan 200061.4AppointedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
4 Nov 201375.2RetiredAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
6 Jan 201980.4DiedAbbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Fabbricatore (VIAF: 89743815)
Abbot Emiliano Fabbricatore O.S.B.I. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Sofia d’Epiro

  • a priest for 53.3 years

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Nov 2013
  • b: CB, 7 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2019

Quantcast