Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Martin von Eyb

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1543Born
11 Oct 158037.6SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
15 Mar 158138.0ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
26 Aug 158340.4ResignedBishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany
27 Aug 159451.4DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Martin von Eyb (VIAF: 72276544)
Father Martin von Eyb (born Mar 1543, died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Bamberg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEybburg

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 128
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast