Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Berardo Cardinal Eroli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1409²Born
13 Nov 144839.8AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
5 Mar 146051.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Mar 146051.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
23 May 147465.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
8 Dec 147465.9ResignedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
2 Apr 147970.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Berardo Eroli
Berardo Cardinal Eroli (born 1409, died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNarni

  • a cardinal for 19.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast