Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franjo Ergelski Hasanović

Deceased

Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jul 1607AppointedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
14 Dec 1608SelectedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
1609¹ResignedBishop of Bosnia (Bosna), Croatia
29 Mar 1610ConfirmedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
17 Dec 1629AppointedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia
1642¹DiedBishop of Zagreb (Agram), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franjo Ergelski Hasanović:
Bishop Franjo Ergelski Hasanović , Bishop of Zagreb (Agram)

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 119, and Page 365
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 8 Feb 2015