Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Ercolani

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1758BornFoligno, Italy
8 Mar 181657.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Jul 181657.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Marco
22 Jul 181657.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Apr 181758.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
10 Dec 182567.1DiedCardinal-Priest of San Marco

MicroData Summary for Luigi Ercolani:
Luigi Cardinal Ercolani (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Marco

  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015