Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Enríquez de Almansa Manrique, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1552²Born
15 Nov 160250.8AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
1603²51.0Ordained BishopBishop of Osma, Spain
21 Jun 161058.4AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
22 Jan 162270.0DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Enríquez de Almansa Manrique (VIAF: 251727607)
Bishop Enrique Enríquez de Almansa Manrique O.S.A. (born 1552, died ) Bishop of Plasencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValladolid

  • a bishop for 19.0 years

Source(s):
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 118, Number 748
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 268, and Page 282
  • bd: CB, 25 Jul 2014
  • bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast