Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Engel, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

Titular Bishop of Tiflis


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1493AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
18 Apr 1493AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiflis
1 May 1493Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiflis
18 Nov 1500DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Albert Engel
Bishop Albert Engel O.F.M. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Paderborn

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 249
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1493, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast