Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Emich, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Titular Bishop of Cyrene


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Aug 1476AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
16 Aug 1476AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
8 Jun 1477Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
24 May 1480DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthias Emich (VIAF: 29931151)
Bishop Matthias Emich O. Carm. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAndernach
Ordained BishopCarmelite, Church, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a bishop for 2.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 142, and Page 278
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1477, Number 4
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 71, Number 5,604

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast