Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Eindhoven, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Azotus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1439Born
145718.0ProfessedMember of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
27 Feb 148344.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
27 Feb 148344.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Azotus
1 Jun 148344.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Azotus
3 Jan 150869.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
7 Oct 150970.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Eindhoven
Bishop Johann von Eindhoven C.R.S.A. (born 1439, died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Trier

EventPlace
Ordained BishopLa Minerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,394
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1483, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast