Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Antonio de’ Vecchi

Deceased

Bishop of Ischia


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Feb 1663AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
18 Feb 1663Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
Apr 1672³DiedBishop of Ischia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio de’ Vecchi
Bishop Giovanni Antonio de’ Vecchi (died Apr 1672) Bishop of Ischia

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 211
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1663, Number 20
  • ob/c2: AT, 28 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 29 Aug 2016