Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martín Duniense

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jan 1219AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
5 Jun 1248ResignedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
5 Oct 1250DiedBishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Martín Duniense:
Bishop Martín Duniense (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mondoñedo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 343
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 294, Number 76

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 24 Feb 2014